BASINGSTOKE CONCERT BAND

Charity number: 1061034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.30k £7.77k £9.63k £9.81k £4.32k
Total expenditure £7.49k £8.06k £8.94k £8.38k £1.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A