Financial history YMCA Walsall

Charity number: 1061084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £451.37k £556.43k £477.86k £583.30k £691.99k
Total expenditure £495.63k £548.19k £496.57k £649.73k £584.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £169.27k N/A
Income from government grants £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k £74.63k £83.07k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £6.90k N/A £9.91k £11.59k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £549.53k N/A £573.39k £672.34k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £8.07k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £548.19k N/A £649.73k £584.95k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A £2.85k £2.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0