Trustees YMCA Walsall

Charity number: 1061084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeremy OAKLEY Chair 17 November 2020
YMCA BLACK COUNTRY GROUP
Received: On time
YMCA WOLVERHAMPTON
Received: On time
Stephanie Paula PATRICK Trustee 06 October 2022
YMCA BLACK COUNTRY GROUP
Received: On time
YMCA WOLVERHAMPTON
Received: On time
Jayne Alison SARGEANT Trustee 07 June 2022
YMCA BLACK COUNTRY GROUP
Received: On time
YMCA WOLVERHAMPTON
Received: On time
JONATHAN ROBERT ROWE Trustee 17 November 2021
YMCA BLACK COUNTRY GROUP
Received: On time
YMCA WOLVERHAMPTON
Received: On time
Mark Allan FUSSELL Trustee 17 November 2021
YMCA BLACK COUNTRY GROUP
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY OLDSWINFORD
Received: On time
YMCA WOLVERHAMPTON
Received: On time
Martin James SHENTON Trustee 17 November 2021
YMCA WOLVERHAMPTON
Received: On time
Pauline TOMLINSON Trustee 17 November 2020
YMCA BLACK COUNTRY GROUP
Received: On time
YMCA WOLVERHAMPTON
Received: On time
Philip WALKER Trustee 19 May 2020
YMCA BLACK COUNTRY GROUP
Received: On time
YMCA WOLVERHAMPTON
Received: On time
MISS ANNE-MARIE GILLESPIE Trustee 07 August 2018
YMCA BLACK COUNTRY GROUP
Received: On time
LIVING SPRINGS
Received: On time
YMCA WOLVERHAMPTON
Received: On time
OLASEINDE BALOGUN Trustee 07 August 2018
YMCA BLACK COUNTRY GROUP
Received: On time
YMCA WOLVERHAMPTON
Received: On time
GRACE AMY ENGLAND Trustee 27 March 2018
YMCA BLACK COUNTRY GROUP
Received: On time
YMCA WOLVERHAMPTON
Received: On time
JOHN WELSBY Trustee 04 November 2015
YMCA BLACK COUNTRY GROUP
Received: On time
YMCA WOLVERHAMPTON
Received: On time