Trustees 1ST WARGRAVE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1061190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LESLEY HUCKER Chair 01 September 2010
None on record
John Wheals Trustee 13 July 2020
None on record
Michael Smith Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Catherine Elizabeth Abbott Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Miller Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record
Kieron Mark Gwyn Edwards Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
Richard Charles Best Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Jo Smith Trustee 01 June 2015
None on record
PETER CONNOR FRY Trustee 01 June 2011
None on record
BILL BOOKLESS Trustee 01 September 1993
None on record
NIGEL BOARD Trustee 01 September 1990
None on record
JANET MARY MOSELEY Trustee 01 June 1986
None on record