SARAH DAVIS BEQUEST

Charity number: 227865-1
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL DATED 30TH MARCH 1894. PROVED 19TH APRIL 1899. UN REP VOL. 122.PP 306. ORDER OF HIGH COURT DATED 25TH NOVEMBER 1902.
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE BRITISH ASYLUM FOR DEAF & DUMB FEMALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
  • 21 October 1963: Standard registration
  • 09 July 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of