THOMAS MOGRIDGE

Charity number: 203721-3
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 4 JANUARY 1884, 30 MARCH 1899, 7 OCTOBER 1910 AND 29 SEPTEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
GRANTS IN AUGMENTATION OF STIPENDS OF INCUMBENTS IN CITY AND COUNTY OF EXETER OR TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE OF ASSISTANT CURATES.
Area of benefit
COUNTY AND CITY OF EXETER
Registration history
  • 30 April 1962: Standard registration
  • 28 April 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 28 April 2014: Funds transferred to 203721 Exeter Church Charities
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of