Financial history THE RALPH LEVY CHARITABLE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 200009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £780.45k £614.77k £453.60k £273.31k £460.40k
Total expenditure £513.96k £525.83k £486.64k £396.31k £478.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £780.12k £612.42k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £327 £796 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £1.55k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £513.96k £525.83k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £17.50k £6.34k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £496.46k £519.49k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A