Financial history JOSEPH FATTORINI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 200032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £28.30k £25.76k £23.22k £20.36k £19.31k
Total expenditure £19.72k £12.45k £20.15k £36.47k £18.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A