CLOPHILL UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 200034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity only operates within Clophill parish making grants to individuals or organisations resident within the parish.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12,737
Total expenditure: £11,719

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 July 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN PAUL BRADBURY Chair 18 September 2013
None on record
Vaughan Charles Wilton Trustee 30 July 2024
None on record
Deborah Bailey Trustee 29 June 2023
None on record
MRS JULIE BENSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.40k £11.71k £11.76k £12.61k £12.74k
Total expenditure £7.88k £6.21k £7.28k £12.64k £11.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 6 JULY 1970 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 19 JULY 1972
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF CLOPHILL WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (FOR DETAILS OF AMALGAMATIONS SEE MAIN RECORD)
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CLOPHILL
Registration history
  • 19 July 1972 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
20B Tanqueray Avenue
Clophill
BEDFORD
MK45 4AW
Phone:
01525860900
Website:

No information available