THE PETER SAMUEL ROYAL FREE FUND

Charity number: 200049
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £28.35k £25.51k £19.84k £28.18k £35.94k
Total expenditure £77.50k £10.35k £11.35k £13.10k £8.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A