FRIENDS OF THE HURTWOOD

Charity number: 200053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £166.88k £170.97k £74.23k £87.23k £66.55k
Total expenditure £72.27k £91.25k £85.67k £80.63k £91.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.55k £9.40k £9.40k £10.50k £3.70k