Accounts and annual returns HENRY SMITH (WORTH ESTATE)
Charity number: 200062

Charity reporting is overdue by 492 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 127 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 127 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 492 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 492 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 December 2021 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 05 January 2020 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window