Financial history HENRY SMITH (WORTH ESTATE)

Charity number: 200062
Charity reporting is overdue by 421 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £5.04k £5.04k £5.04k £5.04k £5.04k
Total expenditure £4.86k £4.97k £4.82k £5.35k £3.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A