POOR LANDS OR PAGES CHARITY

Charity number: 200074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required