Trustees SURREY RECORD SOCIETY

Charity number: 200084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne McCormack Trustee 22 July 2019
FRIENDS OF KINGSTON MUSEUM AND HERITAGE
Received: On time
Jan Mihell Trustee 22 July 2019
None on record
JULIAN POOLEY Trustee 22 July 2019
None on record
SALLY JENKINSON Trustee 10 July 2018
ASH AND DISTRICT LOCAL HISTORY MUSEUM SOCIETY
Received: On time
DR SUE JONES Trustee 12 September 2017
THE LOCAL POPULATION STUDIES SOCIETY
Received: On time
DR DAVID TAYLOR MA, FSA Trustee 12 September 2017
SURREY HISTORY TRUST
Received: On time
DR Mary Alexander FSA Trustee 12 September 2017
None on record
NIGEL BALCHIN Trustee 21 July 2017
None on record
JUDITH ANNE MITCHELL Trustee 12 July 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EPSOM
Received: On time
Dr DAVID BOWES ROBINSON Trustee
BRITISH RECORDS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
MICHAEL PAGE Trustee
None on record