WONERSH UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 200086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 25 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 28 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required