WONERSH UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 200086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £5.10k £5.47k £5.12k £5.33k £5.35k
Total expenditure £8.46k £6.83k £7.85k £5.94k £3.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A