WONERSH UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 200086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Reverend David Keith Peters Trustee 01 June 2021 None on record
DIANE LESLEY SAVAGE Chair 29 September 2010 None on record
Anthony David Kenyon Shutes Trustee 20 May 2021 None on record
MRS PENNY HODGSON Trustee 07 October 2013 None on record
LADY KIRKWOOD Trustee 08 March 2012 None on record
LOUISE ELIZABETH HAMILTON HEALY Trustee 10 June 2010
AGE CONCERN BLACKHEATH AND WONERSH Received: On time
WONERSH MEMORIAL HALL TRUST Received: On time
THE WONERSH AND SHAMLEY GREEN VOLUNTARY PLAYGROUND COMMITTEE Received: On time
RODERICK IAN WEALE Trustee 23 June 2021
CRANLEIGH AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO) Received: On time
SHAMLEY GREEN VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
RACHEL HOLMES Trustee 21 June 2018 None on record
THE REVEREND SALLY JANE DAVIES Trustee 04 July 2006 None on record