Accounts and annual returns The Barnes Fund

Charity number: 200103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 July 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window