Financial history The Barnes Fund

Charity number: 200103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £690.00k £702.48k £721.50k £702.57k £724.88k
Total expenditure £592.59k £769.10k £806.26k £768.26k £955.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £125 £370 £450 £2.92k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £364.02k £367.76k £392.85k £377.00k £389.66k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £325.98k £334.59k £328.28k £325.13k £332.30k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £592.59k £769.10k £806.26k £768.26k £955.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.64k £23.72k £24.12k £32.91k £27.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £222.19k £234.90k £347.66k £241.67k £282.48k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0