DEMPSTER TRUST

Charity number: 200107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required