DEMPSTER TRUST

Charity number: 200107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.69k £12.11k £9.24k £10.63k £7.94k
Total expenditure £10.12k £11.97k £14.49k £11.42k £12.53k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A