Accounts and annual returns PEPER HAROW UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 200126
Charity reporting is overdue by 263 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 263 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 263 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 07 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 15 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required