Financial history PEPER HAROW UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 200126
Charity reporting is overdue by 301 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £2.50k £2.50k £2.50k £2.50k £2.50k
Total expenditure £2.27k £1.40k £3.80k £1.80k £2.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A