MRS JANE CART'S TRUST

Charity number: 200166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download