MRS JANE CART'S TRUST

Charity number: 200166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £108.14k £200.89k £178.97k £202.54k £235.18k
Total expenditure £60.16k £74.05k £87.97k £106.59k £118.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A