Trustees HENRY SMITH'S CHARITY

Charity number: 200169
Charity reporting is overdue by 163 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PATRICK MURPHY Chair 25 September 2011
None on record
Rev Hannah Moore Trustee 02 December 2020
None on record
Richard Rees Trustee 18 May 2020
None on record
Dr Shearn Trustee 28 November 2018
None on record
Valerie Elliott Trustee 05 September 2016
None on record
Roger Gardner Trustee 07 May 2015
None on record
Joan Holroyd Trustee 07 May 2015
None on record