THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST

Charity number: 200176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £319.73k £341.42k £338.62k £335.45k £344.58k
Total expenditure £256.68k £231.73k £270.90k £284.64k £300.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A