Accounts and annual returns FEOFFEE OR CHARITY ESTATE

Charity number: 200188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required