THE 29TH MAY 1961 CHARITY

Charity number: 200198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 30 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 01 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 04 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 08 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 17 January 2018 On time Download