THE 29TH MAY 1961 CHARITY

Charity number: 200198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £3.79m £3.93m £4.20m £5.38m £5.65m
Total expenditure £5.67m £6.60m £4.71m £5.47m £5.69m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £945.56k £0 £0 £15.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £945.56k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.79m £3.93m £4.20m £3.14m £2.49m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.64m £5.61m £3.83m £4.38m £4.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.03m £998.82k £888.35k £1.09m £919.51k
Expenditure - Governance £18.58k £19.28k £19.09k £17.08k £19.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.55m £5.52m £3.73m £4.30m £4.69m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.03m £998.82k £888.35k £1.09m £919.51k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0