THE 29TH MAY 1961 CHARITY

Charity number: 200198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Geoffrey Robert Cox F.C.A. Trustee 01 June 2020 None on record
Elizabeth Rantzen Trustee 06 April 2014
AWARDS FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS Received: On time
REHEARSAL ORCHESTRA Received: On time
PRISON REFORM TRUST Received: On time
THE FIDELIO CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
PAUL VARNEY F.C.A Trustee 06 August 1979 None on record
Charles David Zalenka Martin Trustee 01 June 2020 None on record
ANDREW CHARLES JONES F.C.A. Trustee 12 February 2008 None on record