Accounts and annual returns THE HOOVER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 200274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time Download Open in new window