Financial history THOMAS CHRISTIE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 200281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/10/2017 30/10/2018 30/10/2019 30/10/2020 30/10/2021
Total gross income £27 £37 £59 £34 £1
Total expenditure £0 £0 £450 £0 £2.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A