GOVETT CHARITY

Charity number: 200300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.69k £2.58k £2.79k £2.85k £2.90k
Total expenditure £4.06k £1.45k £3.63k £3.00k £4.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A