CROWHURST RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES

Charity number: 200315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.51k £2.51k £2.60k £7 £2.51k
Total expenditure £4.08k £1.88k £2.53k £663 £700
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A