ST ALBANS CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 200330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JILL EVELYN SINGER Trustee None on record
Prof Peter Thomas Newby Trustee 01 March 2017 None on record
Moragh Elizabeth Ormiston Trustee 06 March 2019 None on record
Mr Robert Osborne Trustee 25 June 2015 None on record
ERIC WILLIAM ROBERTS Trustee None on record
FREDA CHALONER CBE Trustee 02 March 2016 None on record
TIM BOATSWAIN Chair 24 September 2012 None on record