Governing document WOKING HOMES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF 24TH SEPTEMBER 1955 AS AMENDED 26TH MAY 1982, 29TH JUNE 1991 AND 13 OCTOBER 2001, 29 AUGUST 2007, 29 SEPTEMBER 2007, AND BY SCHEME OF 28 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME BEEN EMPLOYED IN ANY CAPACITY IN CONNECTION WITH THE RAIL INDUSTRY ('RAILWAY WORKER') AND CONNECTED BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE IN NEED BY ANY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED. IN THESE OBJECTS ' CONNECTED BENEFICIARIES' MEANS SUCH PERSONS CONNECTED WITH A RAILWAY WORKER AS DETERMINED IN THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.