Accounts and annual returns BYFLEET VILLAGE HALL, WORKING MEN'S CLUB AND INSTITUTE

Charity number: 200352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window