WORPLESDON UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 200382
Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £2.67k £2.67k £2.68k £2.70k £3.12k
Total expenditure £3.20k £2.50k £2.60k £850 £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A