OPPENHEIMER CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To benefit such registered charities as the trustees think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 August 1961: Standard registration
- 22 April 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | 31/10/2005 | 31/10/2006 | 31/10/2007 | 31/10/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.00k | £60.00k | £66.04k | £60.00k | £60.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.00k | £60.40k | £39.80k | £87.05k | £61.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 12 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | 12 February 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | 14 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | 14 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | 05 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | 05 July 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 13 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | 13 March 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | 25 May 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | 25 May 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 MAY 1961 AND DEED DATED 19 MAY 1961
Charitable objects
PAYMENTS TO AND FOR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND BODIES OF PERSONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES, WHETHER WITHIN OR WITHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window