ST JOHNS HOMES

Charity number: 200397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £94.25k £95.57k £100.88k £94.91k £90.55k
Total expenditure £76.53k £78.87k £86.07k £90.15k £90.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A