Accounts and annual returns ST PETER'S CHURCH HALL (TRUST 1193)

Charity number: 200407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 November 2019 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required