THE MICKLEHAM ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 200410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 October 2020 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 767 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 April 2017 On time Download