Financial history WIMBLEDON GUILD OF SOCIAL WELFARE (INCORPORATED)

Charity number: 200424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.74m £1.70m £1.84m £1.60m £1.80m
Total expenditure £2.20m £2.17m £2.61m £2.42m £2.66m
Income from government contracts £0 £99.02k £78.90k £78.90k £78.90k
Income from government grants £55.09k £99.02k £204.00k £352.39k £304.71k
Income - Donations and legacies £53.24k £64.58k £83.64k £162.47k £118.78k
Income - Other trading activities £264.10k £128.31k £122.47k £53.76k £108.34k
Income - Charitable activities £902.26k £938.09k £1.10m £1.10m £1.21m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £500 £0 £0
Income - Investment £516.71k £570.11k £528.32k £277.68k £358.70k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.45k £1.00k £500 £4.21k £5.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.63m £1.68m £2.11m £2.03m £2.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £574.92k £488.68k £497.36k £385.49k £482.88k
Expenditure - Governance £52.46k £70.74k £80.68k £80.57k £91.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £81.18k £80.56k £80.68k £77.34k £8.84k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0