RICHMOND CHARITIES

Charity number: 200431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV WILMA ROEST MA Trustee 25 July 2016
STEPHEN ROBERTS MEMORIAL TRUST Received: On time
CHARLOTTE WADE CHARITY Received: On time
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY Received: On time
THE RICHMOND AID IN SICKNESS FUND Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, RICHMOND WITH ST MATTHIAS AND ST JOHN THE DIVINE Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY Received: On time
STEPHEN JOHN KING Trustee 12 March 2013
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY Received: On time
THE RICHMOND AID IN SICKNESS FUND Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY Received: On time
MARGARET ANNE MARSHALL Trustee 14 May 2012
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY Received: On time
THE RICHMOND AID IN SICKNESS FUND Received: On time
KEW COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY Received: On time
MICHAEL TOWNSIN Trustee 18 July 2018
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY Received: On time
THE RICHMOND AID IN SICKNESS FUND Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY Received: On time
KATHRYN ANN O'BRIEN Trustee 21 November 2018
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY Received: On time
THE RICHMOND AID IN SICKNESS FUND Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY Received: On time
Dr Alexander James McDonald HALL Trustee 23 January 2019
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY Received: On time
THE RICHMOND AID IN SICKNESS FUND Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY Received: On time
EMMA HALFORD Trustee 20 November 2019
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY Received: On time
THE RICHMOND AID IN SICKNESS FUND Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY Received: On time
SERGE LOURIE Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF KINGSTON HOSPITAL Received: On time
PETER WILLIAM CHICHELEY MARR Chair None on record
JEREMY WILLIAMS Trustee 04 June 2014
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY Received: On time
THE RICHMOND AID IN SICKNESS FUND Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY Received: On time
Katherine Theresa Maxwell Trustee 21 October 2015
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY Received: On time
THE RICHMOND AID IN SICKNESS FUND Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY Received: On time
CLLR RICHARD PYNE Trustee 22 January 2020
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY Received: On time
THE RICHMOND AID IN SICKNESS FUND Received: On time
RICHMOND PARISH LANDS CHARITY Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY Received: On time