Financial history THE RICHMOND AID IN SICKNESS FUND

Charity number: 200434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.74k £5.61k £5.72k £5.84k £5.95k
Total expenditure £6.16k £5.50k £6.90k £5.80k £5.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A