Trustees THE RICHMOND AID IN SICKNESS FUND

Charity number: 200434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER WILLIAM CHICHELEY MARR Chair
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY
Received: On time
PAUL PHILLIPS Trustee 25 May 2022
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY
Received: On time
RICHMOND CHARITIES
Received: On time
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
JONATHAN BLYTHE Trustee 26 January 2022
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY
Received: On time
RICHMOND CHARITIES
Received: On time
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
CLLR RICHARD PYNE Trustee 22 January 2020
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY
Received: On time
RICHMOND CHARITIES
Received: On time
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
RICHMOND PARISH LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
EMMA HALFORD Trustee 20 November 2019
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY
Received: On time
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
RICHMOND CHARITIES
Received: On time
Dr Alexander James McDonald HALL Trustee 23 January 2019
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY
Received: On time
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
RICHMOND CHARITIES
Received: On time
KATHRYN ANN O'BRIEN Trustee 21 November 2018
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY
Received: On time
RICHMOND CHARITIES
Received: On time
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
MICHAEL TOWNSIN Trustee 18 July 2018
RICHMOND CHARITIES
Received: On time
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev WILMA ROEST MA Trustee 25 July 2016
RICHMOND CHARITIES
Received: On time
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, RICHMOND WITH ST MATTHIAS AND ST JOHN THE DIVINE
Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARLOTTE WADE CHARITY
Received: On time
STEPHEN ROBERTS MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
Katherine Theresa Maxwell Trustee 21 October 2015
RICHMOND CHARITIES
Received: On time
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY
Received: On time
JEREMY WILLIAMS Trustee 04 June 2014
RICHMOND CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY
Received: On time
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
MARGARET ANNE MARSHALL Trustee 14 May 2012
RICHMOND CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY
Received: On time
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
MR SERGE LOURIE Trustee
POEMS IN THE WAITING ROOM LIMITED
Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY
Received: On time
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
ELIZA, COUNTESS OF DERBY
Received: On time