AGE CONCERN (MERTON)

Charity number: 200436
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2005 14 March 2006 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Overdue Overdue by 5576 days
Annual return 31 July 2004 06 May 2005 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2004 09 December 2004 On time