MILWICH CHURCH HALL (TRUST NO 1195)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church Village Hall used for Church and Village Community Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 05 September 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STUART HODSON | Chair | 22 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £832 | £250 | £1.33k | £3.52k | £8.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.96k | £2.87k | £3.55k | £3.20k | £2.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2025 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 December 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 December 2022 | 424 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 31/07/1961
Charitable objects
1. SITE FOR A VICARAGE, PARSONAGE HOUSE OR RESIDENCE FOR A CURATE, CHURCH, CHAPEL OR CHURCH HALL, MISSION ROOM, PARISH ROOM OR CLASS ROOM, MEETING OR LECTURE ROOM OR SUNDAY SCHOOL. 2. THE CELEBRATION OF DIVINE SERVICE THEREIN. 3. PAYMENT OF CHURCH EXPENSES, UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CHURCH, IT'S FURNISHINGS OR THE CHURCHYARD. 4. ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND RESIDING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OR ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MILWICH ALL SAINTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
TREBRYN
MILWICH
STAFFORD
ST18 0EG
- Phone:
- 01889505414
- Email:
- rshodson@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window